Queen v. White
Petitioner: Katreese Queen
Respondent: Maurice White
Case Number: 1:2019cv01745
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting deadline for Plaintiff to file her response to the government's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/11/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 7/11/19-das)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Service on Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Marquardt, Sarah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Rule 12/56 letter and advising the Court that plaintiff did not receive the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Katreese Queen (dass, Deputy Clerk) (dass, Deputy Clerk).
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Maurice White (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Marquardt, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) ADDED IN ERROR on 6/24/2019: #3 Rule 12/56 Letter) Modified on 6/24/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 REMOVAL NOTIFICATION LETTER mailed to Plaintiff. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 PEACE ORDER ADDENDUM (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Addendum to #3 Petition for Peace Order filed by Katreese Queen. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 CEASE AND DESIST NOTICE. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Respondent. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEMPORARY PEACE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joyce M. Baylor-Thompson 6/10/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Peace Order against Maurice White, filed by Katreese Queen.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Marquardt, Sarah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Baltimore City, case number 0101SP085222019., filed by Maurice White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Temporary Peace Order as filed in State Court, #4 Notice to Respondent as filed in State Court, #5 Petition for Peace Order as filed in State Court, #6 Cease and Desist Notice as filed in State Court, #7 Addendum to Petition for Peace Order as filed in State Court, #8 Peace Order Addendum as filed in State Court)(Marquardt, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Katreese Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maurice White
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?