Taleb v. Glass Health Programs Inc.
Plaintiff: Edith Taleb
Defendant: Glass Health Programs Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01761
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/26/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Glass Health Programs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kresslein, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/9/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Glass Health Programs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kresslein, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Glass Health Programs Inc.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glass Health Programs Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115890) filed by Edith Taleb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taleb v. Glass Health Programs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Taleb
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glass Health Programs Inc.
Represented By: Charles Joseph Kresslein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?