Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Pushkin et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: William T. Brooks, Jr. and Nancy C. Pushkin
Case Number: 1:2019cv01801
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #13 Order, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Aguirre, Samir)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file and serve a motion for entry of default as to Defendant William T. Brooks, Jr. or provide a report to the Court why such motion is inappropriate. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/16/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Check Received on 7/16/2019 from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Check Number: 2352428. Amount: $11,615.01. Receipt # 14637116585. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #8 Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Nancy C. Pushkin.(Brown, Augustus)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Nancy C. Pushkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Answer, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Answer)(Brown, Augustus)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Nancy C. Pushkin served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019.(Aguirre, Samir)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. William T. Brooks, Jr served on 6/23/2019, answer due 7/15/2019.(Aguirre, Samir)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/20/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to William T. Brooks, Jr, Nancy C. Pushkin.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Summons (William T. Brooks, Jr.) (Aguirre, Samir)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Summons (Nancy C. Pushkin) (Aguirre, Samir)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Aguirre, Samir)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Aguirre, Samir)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8081098.), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Aguirre, Samir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Pushkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gail Lynn Westover
Represented By: Samir Alfonso Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Brooks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy C. Pushkin
Represented By: Augustus F Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?