Wallace v. Cecil County Fair, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Drue Chichi Wallace
Defendant: Monica Mason, Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, John Doe, Cecil County Fair, Inc., Alfred Miller, Deborah Ann Harris and Don Moore
Case Number: 1:2019cv01802
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing by Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., John Doe, Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Bredeck, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing by Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., John Doe, Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Bredeck, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/7/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
July 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; Denying as Moot #18 Motion to Shorten Time to Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/18/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore or counsel for Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , #18 MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Drue Chichi Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., John Doe, Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Bredeck, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., John Doe, Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Bredeck, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Jo Ann Bashore served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Emily Berkey served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Monica Mason served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Deborah Ann Harris served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Cecil County Fair, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Alfred Miller served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drue Chichi Wallace. Don Moore served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/11/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Drue Chichi Wallace to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Drue Chichi Wallace files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/8/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Drue Chichi Wallace re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Mantzavinos, Megan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jo Ann Bashore, Emily Berkey, Cecil County Fair, Inc., Deborah Ann Harris, Monica Mason, Alfred Miller, Don Moore.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 6/21/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Drue Chichi Wallace or counsel for Drue Chichi Wallace are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/5/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Drue Chichi Wallace was filed incorrectly. **The following attachment is missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file attachment Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link attachment Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8083565.), filed by Drue Chichi Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Mantzavinos, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Cecil County Fair, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann Bashore
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Berkey
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil County Fair, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Ann Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bredeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drue Chichi Wallace
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?