Poe v. State of Maryland, et al.

Plaintiff: Mr. earl dwayne poe and Earl Dwayne Poe
Defendant: STATE OF MARYLAND, Baltimore City Dentention Center and Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv01819
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss by Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullally, Laura)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #21 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Request for Extension of Time to File, #16 Request for Extension of Time to File, 18 Order, 17 QC Notice - Miscellaneous. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/23/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Request for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/23/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Request for Extension of Time to File , #16 Request for Extension of Time to File, #18 Order, 17 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, by Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland(Mullally, Laura)
July 21, 2019 Filing 20 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Glass, Michael)
July 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Request for Extension of Time to File by Earl Dwayne Poe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glass, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #16 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland, Baltimore City Dentention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/19/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR)QC NOTICE: #16 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland, Baltimore City Dentention Center was filed incorrectly.***Please refile using the correct event & Motions & Extension of Time to File Answer. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/19/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Mullally, Laura) Modified on 7/19/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/19/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Mullally, Laura)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #13 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland in response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Mullally, Laura)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland (Mullally, Laura)
June 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14637115948 (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by State of Maryland was filed incorrectly. When filing a Notice of Removal, attachments can not be labeled as exhibits - The attachments must be separately labeled with the name of the document ex: complaint, summons, etc... No corrections needed at this time; however any future Notice of Removals filed must be as stated above. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 The case of Poe v. State of Maryland, et al., has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is RDB19cv1819. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/21/2019.
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/21/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 The above documents #4 through #7 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court of Maryland for Baltimore City. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services and State of Maryland. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for this Court to Entertain Action and Request for Hearing by Earl Dwayne Poe (Attachments: #1 Order)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 30 days as to Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services and State of Maryland.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Baltimore City Dentention Center, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services, State of Maryland, filed by Earl Dwayne Poe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STATE OF MARYLAND(Mullally, Laura)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Mullally on behalf of All Defendants (Mullally, Laura)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and notice of removal against State of Maryland, et al., filed by State of Maryland, Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services and Baltimore City Detention Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mullally, Laura) Modified on 6/21/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. State of Maryland, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Laura Mullally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Dentention Center
Represented By: Laura Mullally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Department of Public Safety & Correctional Services
Represented By: Laura Mullally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. earl dwayne poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Dwayne Poe
Represented By: Michael E Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?