Bethel Ministries, Inc. v. Salmon et al
Plaintiff: Bethel Ministries, Inc.
Defendant: Elizabeth Green, Matthew Gallagher, A. Skipp Sanders, Beth Harbinson, Linda Ebergart, Nancy S. Grasmick, Karen B. Salmon, Marva Jo Camp, Dr. A. Skipp Sanders, Linda Eberhart, Dr. Nancy S. Grasmick, Beth Sandbower Harbinson and Dr. Karen B. Salmon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01853
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory Baylor. Directing attorney Gregory Baylor to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Marva Jo Camp, Linda Eberhart, Matthew Gallagher, Nancy S. Grasmick, Elizabeth Green, Beth Sandbower Harbinson, Karen B. Salmon, A. Skipp Sanders. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/24/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Marva Jo Camp, Linda Eberhart, Matthew Gallagher, Nancy S. Grasmick, Elizabeth Green, Beth Sandbower Harbinson, Karen B. Salmon, A. Skipp Sanders (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Sarah)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory Baylor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8137802.) by Bethel Ministries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Court Admissions)(Garza, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summonses, Motions for Pro Hac Vice served on Office of the Maryland Attorney General Brian Fosh on 07/11/2019, filed by Bethel Ministries, Inc..(Garza, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bethel Ministries, Inc.. Marva Jo Camp served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Linda Eberhart served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Matthew Gallagher served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Nancy S. Grasmick served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Elizabeth Green served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Beth Sandbower Harbinson served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Karen B. Salmon served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; A. Skipp Sanders served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019.(Garza, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David A Cortman. Directing attorney David A Cortman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christen Price. Directing attorney Christen Price to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christiana M Holcomb. Directing attorney Christiana M Holcomb to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Marva Jo Camp, Linda Eberhart, Matthew Gallagher, Nancy S. Grasmick, Elizabeth Green, Beth Sandbower Harbinson, Karen B. Salmon, A. Skipp Sanders.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Cortman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8088228.) by Bethel Ministries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Court Admissions)(Garza, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christen Price (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8088221.) by Bethel Ministries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Court Admissions)(Garza, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christiana Holcomb (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8088208.) by Bethel Ministries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Court Admissions, #2 Certification of Previous Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Garza, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bethel Ministries, Inc. (Garza, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marva Jo Camp, Linda Ebergart, Matthew Gallagher, Nancy S. Grasmick, Elizabeth Green, Beth Harbinson, Karen B. Salmon, A. Skipp Sanders ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8088114.), filed by Bethel Ministries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Garza, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethel Ministries, Inc. v. Salmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Green
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gallagher
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Skipp Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Harbinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ebergart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy S. Grasmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen B. Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marva Jo Camp
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. A. Skipp Sanders
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Eberhart
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nancy S. Grasmick
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Sandbower Harbinson
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Karen B. Salmon
Represented By: Sarah W Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethel Ministries, Inc.
Represented By: John R Garza
Represented By: David A Cortman
Represented By: Gregory Baylor
Represented By: Christen M Price
Represented By: Christiana M Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?