Edwards v. Lasarko
Plaintiff: James Edwards
Defendant: Marcus Joseph Lasarko
Case Number: 1:2019cv01897
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 8/12/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Robinson, Clifford)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marcus Joseph Lasarko (Robinson, Clifford)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: All Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/25/2019. (daws, Chambers)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/25/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/25/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/24/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Telephone status conference held on 7/24/2019 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM to Counsel scheduling conference call. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/27/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Marcus Joseph Lasarko. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Marcus Joseph Lasarko filed by James Edwards.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-002602. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8094841), filed by Marcus J Lasarko. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State CRT Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment State CRT Answer, #4 Attachment State CRT Demand Jury Trial, #5 Attachment State CRT Cert Regarding DISC, #6 Attachment State CRT Disclosure Notice, #7 Attachment Compliance State Pleadings Filed in US DCRT, #8 Attachment CERT Service NTC Sent to State CRT, #9 Attachment State CRT Cert Service)(Robinson, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Lasarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Joseph Lasarko
Represented By: Clifford A Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edwards
Represented By: Timothy J Capurso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?