Ravita v. American National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Salvatore Ravita
Defendant: American National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01899
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/22/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Mediation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/22/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by American National Insurance Company.(Ward, Margaret)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American National Insurance Company for American National Insurance Company.(Ward, Margaret)
June 28, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to American National Insurance Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/5/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by American National Insurance Company (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 30 days as to American National Insurance Company.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American National Insurance Company, filed by John Salvatore Ravita. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County Maryland, case number C-03-CV-19-1716. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637116059), filed by American National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravita v. American National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Salvatore Ravita
Represented By: Aaron J Turner
Represented By: Debra B Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?