Tennant v. Flewellyn et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Lynn Tennant
Defendant: James Flewellyn, Robin Flewellyn, Motor Vessel POWERPLAY and Powerplay, Motor Vessel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01912
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James Flewellyn, Robin Flewellyn, Powerplay, Motor Vessel.(Wilford, Elaine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peggy Lynn Tennant. James Flewellyn served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Robin Flewellyn served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019.(Buck, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to James Flewellyn, Robin Flewellyn.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against James Flewellyn, Robin Flewellyn, Motor Vessel POWERPLAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8096866.), filed by Peggy Lynn Tennant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Buck, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennant v. Flewellyn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Lynn Tennant
Represented By: Christopher Douglas Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Flewellyn
Represented By: Elaine Ruth Wilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Flewellyn
Represented By: Elaine Ruth Wilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motor Vessel POWERPLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerplay, Motor Vessel
Represented By: Elaine Ruth Wilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?