Williams v. State of Maryland, Office of Governor et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Williams
Defendant: State of Maryland, Office of Governor and Baltimore County Office of Child Support Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2019cv01938
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Baltimore County Office of Child Support Enforcement served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; State of Maryland, Office of Governor served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County Office of Child Support Enforcement, State of Maryland, Office of Governor. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING Clerk to mail Order and two U.S. Marshal 285 forms to plaintiff; GRANTING plaintiff 21 days to complete the forms and return to the Clerk and provide service copies of the complaint as therein set forth. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/8/2019. (c/m w/forms 8/9/2019) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Williams(jb5s, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore County Office of Child Support Enforcement, State of Maryland, Office of Governor, filed by Brandon Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 1d, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 2b, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5a, #10 Exhibit 5b, #11 Exhibit 5c, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 6b, #14 Summons, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #16 Exhibit 4) (hmls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. State of Maryland, Office of Governor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland, Office of Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Office of Child Support Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?