Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Plaintiff: Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc.
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01958
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER NOTIFYING Counsel that the settlement conference previously set for December 12, 2019 has been RESCHEDULED to Thursday, January 9, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Ex parte letters are now due Thursday, December 26, 2019. Counsel are advised to follow the instructions as set forth in the original Order Scheduling Settlement dated August 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/28/2019. (vals, Chambers)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/22/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hwang, Peter)
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Pak, Jessica)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: All Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/19/2019. (daws, Chambers)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/19/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER transferring case to a United States Magistrate Judge and cancelling telephone conference. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/19/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #23 Scheduling Order Joint Response to Letter Order #23 filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited.(Reede, George)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MARGINAL ORDER approving #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/5/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. (Hwang, Peter)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/19/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. (Hwang, Peter)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hwang, Peter)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K Hwang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hwang, Peter)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (ECF #13 ). Mail sent to Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Removal Notification letter mailed to Plaintiff's counsel (c/m 7/15/2019)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (ECF #12 ). Mail sent to Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 [FILED IN ERROR] Correspondence from US District Court of Maryland re: Removal Notification Letter(jb5, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/15/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR-Correspondence from US District of Court of Maryland re: Removal Notification Letter(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal /Statement Concerning Removal filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Pak, Jessica)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Jessica)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy)(Pak, Jessica)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/3/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Summons Returned Executed by Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc.. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 State Court Complaint against Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., filed by Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Information Sheet, #2 State Court Summons)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.5 (a)(Pak, Jessica)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited.(Pak, Jessica)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Pak, Jessica)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-002806 CN. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8103635), filed by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Case Information Sheet, #4 Writ of Summons, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., #5 Writ of Summons, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., #6 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing of Removal in State Court)(Pak, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton Discount Liquors, Inc.
Represented By: Peter K Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Represented By: George E Reede, Jr
Represented By: Jessica E Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: George E Reede, Jr
Represented By: Jessica E Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?