Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01997
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/10/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #6 Notice (Other) of Filing Error (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC of Inability to Confer (Hoppe, Jon) Modified on 7/9/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon) Modified on 7/9/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC of Inability to Confer (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8111268.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jon Alexander Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?