Scott v. Lori et al
Plaintiff: Adrian R. Scott
Defendant: Patricia Bennett, William E Lori, Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Baltimore, Penny M Lewis, Melissa M. Hafner, Our Daily Bread Employment Center Fund, Inc, Mary Ann McCloskey, Associated Catholic Charities Inc. and Patricia Bennett-Lynch
Case Number: 1:2019cv02014
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian R. Scott. Associated Catholic Charities Inc. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; William E Lori served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Mary Ann McCloskey served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Our Daily Bread Employment Center Fund, Inc served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Baltimore served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/22/2019. (c/m 08/22/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. All Plaintiffs or counsel for All Plaintiffs are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/5/2019. (c/m 08/22/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Defendants. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/22/2019. (c/m 08/22/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 21 Days from the Date of this Order in which to Provide Service Copies, Summons and Marshal Forms and Return to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/22/2019. (c/m 07/22/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrian R. Scott(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Associated Catholic Charities Inc., Patricia Bennett, Melissa M. Hafner, Penny M Lewis, William E Lori, Mary Ann McCloskey, Our Daily Bread Employment Center Fund, Inc, Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Baltimore, filed by Adrian R. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Right to Sue Letter, #3 Attachment 1, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Summons)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Lori et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E Lori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archdiocese of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa M. Hafner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our Daily Bread Employment Center Fund, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Catholic Charities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Bennett-Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian R. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?