Medrano et al v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: Sara Haidee Aleman Medrano and Resources for Immigrant Support and Empowerment Coalition of Western Maryland
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera, Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins, Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead, Frederick County, Maryland, Frederick County Sheriff's Office, Frederick County Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins, Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead and Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera
Case Number: 1:2019cv02038
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion Challenging Designation of Related Case and Motion for Reassignment. Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/23/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION Challenging Designation of Related Case and Motion for Reassignment filed by Sara Haidee Aleman Medrano, Resources for Immigrant Support and Empowerment Coalition of Western Maryland.(Hayes, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Karp on behalf of Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera, Frederick County Sheriff's Office, Frederick County, Maryland, Frederick County Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins, Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead (Karp, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Challenging Designation of Related Case and Motion for Reassignment by Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera, Frederick County Sheriff's Office, Frederick County, Maryland, Frederick County Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins, Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support thereof)(Karpinski, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sara Haidee Aleman Medrano, Resources for Immigrant Support and Empowerment Coalition of Western Maryland. All Defendants.(Hayes, John)
July 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera, Frederick County Sheriff's Office, Frederick County, Maryland, Frederick County Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins, Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A Jeon on behalf of Sara Haidee Aleman Medrano, Resources for Immigrant Support and Empowerment Coalition of Western Maryland (Jeon, Deborah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Taichi Steiner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steiner, Nicholas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8117730.), filed by Sara Haidee Aleman Medrano, Resources for Immigrant Support and Empowerment Coalition of Western Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Charles A. Jenkins, #3 Summons Brian M. Mothershead, #4 Summons Randy C. Barrera, #5 Summons Frederick County, Maryland, #6 Summons Frederick County Sheriff's Office)(Whittaker, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medrano et al v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County, Maryland
Represented By: John S Mathias
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Daniel Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Daniel Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County Sheriff Charles A. Jenkins
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Daniel Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Brian M. Mothershead
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Daniel Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County Deputy Sheriff Randy C. Barrera
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Daniel Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Haidee Aleman Medrano
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resources for Immigrant Support and Empowerment Coalition of Western Maryland
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?