Grove v. AXA Advisors, LLC
Plaintiff: Justin G. Grove
Defendant: AXA Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02040
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS Correspondence to counsel advising that the conference call to discuss the proposed scheduling order originally scheduled for August 22, 2019 has been rescheduled to September 18, 2019 at 9 am. (Blake, Catherine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by AXA Advisors, LLC.(Bell, Colin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to all Parties of Removal and of Filing a Copy of such Notice in State Court by AXA Advisors, LLC (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE Circuit Court for Frederick County. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to AXA Advisors, LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against AXA Advisors, LLC, filed by Justin G. Grove. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by AXA Advisors, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Bell, Colin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate(Bell, Colin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AXA Advisors, LLC identifying Other Affiliate AXA Distribution Holding Corporation for AXA Advisors, LLC.(Bell, Colin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Frederick County, case number C-10-CV-19-000436. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8118304), filed by AXA Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cover ltr fr Pl..'s counsel with Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Ct Case Info Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Election for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit 6 - NOS of Discovery, #7 Exhibit 7 - Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit 8 - Requests for Production, #9 Certificate of Notice to all Adverse Parties)(Bell, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grove v. AXA Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Colin Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin G. Grove
Represented By: David B Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?