Kelly v. Powers et al
Plaintiff: patrick kelly and Patrick Kelly, derivatively on behalf of Emerald Green Ventures, LLC
Defendant: James Tracy Taylor, Meredith L Priddy, Brent Berisford, John Powers, RX Remedies, Inc., Daniel Powers and Meredith Priddy
Case Number: 1:2019cv02043
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by Patrick Kelly.(Maneche, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor.(Spence, Adam)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal ; denying #8 Motion to Seal Exhibit A (Docket 2) to Motion to Seal Exhibit B (Docket 4); Directing Clerk to Unseal ECF #2 and #3 . Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/9/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand by Patrick Kelly (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maneche, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A (Docket 2) to Motion to Seal Exhibit B (Docket 4), #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #18 Memorandum, #16 Order, #20 Memorandum -- LINE OF NO OPPOSITION TO UNSEALING -- filed by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor.(Spence, Adam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum re #8 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A (Docket 2) to Motion to Seal Exhibit B (Docket 4), #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal filed by Patrick Kelly.(Maneche, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patrick Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Maneche, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum re #8 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A (Docket 2) to Motion to Seal Exhibit B (Docket 4), #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal filed by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor.(Spence, Adam)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #10 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor.(Spence, Adam)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Defendants to file simultaneous briefs on 8/2/2019 re #8 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Notice of Removal and #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal filed by Meredith Priddy, Brent Berisford, RX Remedies, Inc., John Powers, James Tracy Taylor, Daniel Powers. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss)(Spence, Adam)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Patrick Kelly (Maneche, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Maneche on behalf of Patrick Kelly (Maneche, Mark)
July 12, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (11-12) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor, filed by Patrick Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/12/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright (c/m 7/12/19 to Register of Copyrights)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A (Docket 2) to Motion to Seal Exhibit B (Docket 4) by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Sealing Exhibits A & B (Docket Nos. 2 & 3))(Spence, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Spence, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.5(a)(Spence, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor (Spence, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor(Spence, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 UNSEALED PER #23 ORDER - Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal(Exhibit B for Non-Public View) by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor(Spence, Adam) Modified on 7/12/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/9/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 UNSEALED PER #23 ORDER - Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal(Exhibit A for Non-Public View) by Brent Berisford, Daniel Powers, John Powers, Meredith Priddy, RX Remedies, Inc., James Tracy Taylor(Spence, Adam) Modified on 7/12/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/9/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-003016. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8119456), filed by Brent Berisford, John Powers, James Tracy Taylor, Daniel Powers, RX Remedies, Inc., Meredith L Priddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit C - State Court Information Report, #3 Exhibit D - Summons')(Spence, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Powers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: patrick kelly
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Herbert Burgunder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kelly, derivatively on behalf of Emerald Green Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tracy Taylor
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith L Priddy
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Berisford
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Powers
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RX Remedies, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Powers
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Priddy
Represented By: Adam Mattingly Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?