McAllister Towing of New York, LLC v. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: McAllister Towing of New York, LLC
Defendant: Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02054
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Writ of MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT Request for Additional Issue of Writ per Court's Order [ECF 6] (Attachments: #1 PMAG - BofA)(Simms, J)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Issue of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Epic Applied Technologies, LLC.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order Authorizing Issuance of Writs of Maritime Attachment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment - BofA)(Simms, J)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Simms, J)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Epic Applied Technologies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8121564.), filed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Simms, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister Towing of New York, LLC v. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McAllister Towing of New York, LLC
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?