Therapure Biopharma, Inc. et al v. DynPort Vaccine Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Therapure Biopharma, Inc.
Defendant: DynPort Vaccine Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02092
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Joint Motion for Extension of Time; denying #21 Defendant DVC's Motion to Dismiss; and vacating the Court's 8/26/19 scheduling order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/28/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's Response, and Defendant's Reply by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rock, Loreal)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/26/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DynPort Vaccine Company LLC, filed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roach, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 QC NOTICE: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc. needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against DynPort Vaccine Company LLC, filed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc..(Roach, John) Modified on 8/26/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Continue Briefing Deadlines by Therapure Biopharma, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roach, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation, Other Affiliate General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc., Other Affiliate CSRA LLC for DynPort Vaccine Company LLC.(Rock, Loreal)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 QC NOTICE: #20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement and add the corporate parent and/or affiliations when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jerry Lloyd, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Rock, Loreal)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for DynPort Vaccine Company LLC.(Rock, Loreal) Modified on 8/9/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A Doornweerd. Attorney Michael A Doornweerd will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/6/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Savner. Directing attorney Emily Savner to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/6/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Previn Warren. Directing attorney Previn Warren to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/6/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Doornweerd (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8160547.) by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC(Rock, Loreal)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emily Savner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8160540.) by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC(Rock, Loreal)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Previn Warren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8160524.) by DynPort Vaccine Company LLC(Rock, Loreal)
July 31, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS NOTICE: 9 25 Pct Mag - Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge. **Order referring case to a Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings was filed in error. Please disregard. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/1/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc.. Therapure Biopharma, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019.(Roach, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #6 Affidavit of Service filed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 7/31/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Loreal Rock on behalf of DynPort Vaccine Company LLC (Rock, Loreal)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Dynport Vaccine Company, LLC on July 19, 2019, filed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc..(Roach, John) Modified on 7/31/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 7/17/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Therapure Biopharma, Inc. or counsel for Therapure Biopharma, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/31/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to DynPort Vaccine Company LLC.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Therapure Biopharma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Catalyst Fund Limited Partnership II (Investment Fund), Other Affiliate Therapure Biopharma (USA) Inc., Other Affiliate Evolve Biologics Inc., Other Affiliate Evolve Biologics (USA) Inc. for Therapure Biopharma, Inc..(Roach, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DynPort Vaccine Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8127297.), filed by Therapure Biopharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roach, John) Modified on 7/17/2019 (ko, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Therapure Biopharma, Inc. et al v. DynPort Vaccine Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therapure Biopharma, Inc.
Represented By: John L Roach, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DynPort Vaccine Company LLC
Represented By: Michael A Doornweerd
Represented By: Emily Savner
Represented By: Loreal Rock
Represented By: Previn Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?