Hutson et al v. Gray et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Hutson and Thomas Hutson
Defendant: Brambles Electric, Inc. and Douglas Scott Gray
Case Number: 1:2019cv02145
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Defendants Douglas Scott Gray and Brambles Electric, Inc. must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Byers, Larissa) Modified on 8/30/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Brambles Electric, Inc., Douglas Scott Gray or counsel for Brambles Electric, Inc., Douglas Scott Gray are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/3/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 QC NOTICE re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Douglas Scott Gray, Brambles Electric, Inc. **Attorney Diana Kobrin is also listed on answer as counsel for Defendants. Ms Kobrin must enter her appearance using her own CM/ECF log in and password in order to receive future notices. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brambles Electric, Inc. (Byers, Larissa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants, Douglas Scott Gray and Brambles Electric, Inc.'s, ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brambles Electric, Inc., Douglas Scott Gray.(Byers, Larissa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey Hutson. Douglas Scott Gray served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019.(Jones, Francis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey Hutson. Brambles Electric, Inc. served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019.(Jones, Francis)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs must correct the following error:**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR-incorrect event) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Jones, Francis) Modified on 8/6/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/23/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Stacey Hutson, Thomas Hutson or counsel for Stacey Hutson, Thomas Hutson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/6/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Brambles Electric, Inc., Douglas Scott Gray.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8136574.), filed by Stacey Hutson, Thomas Hutson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Defendant Brambles Electric, Inc., #2 Summons Summons for Defendant Douglas Scott Gray, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutson et al v. Gray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brambles Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Larissa N Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Scott Gray
Represented By: Larissa N Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Hutson
Represented By: Francis Joseph Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hutson
Represented By: Francis Joseph Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?