Meadows v. Labcorp
Plaintiff: Gabriel Meadows
Defendant: Labcorp
Case Number: 1:2019cv02149
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/11/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m of order & U.S. Marshal form 9.11.19)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ;Response to #4 Order(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff fourteen days from the date of this Order to file a completed,signed, and dated financial affidavit. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/26/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m of Order & IFP Form 8/27/19)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by Gabriel Meadows (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabriel Meadows(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Labcorp, filed by Gabriel Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Labcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?