Jeffries v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Tyrell Jeffries
Defendant: Wayne Jenkins, Maurice Ward, marcus taylor and Evodio Hendrix
Case Number: 1:2019cv02152
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel: Please provide a status report as to service of the complaint by SEPTEMBER 20, 2019. (Blake, Catherine)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Wayne Jenkins, Marcus Taylor, Maurice Ward re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal Joint Statement Concerning Removal (Duke, Neil)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Maurice Ward.(Jeffries, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tyrell Jeffries (Rhodes, James)
July 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/23/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Evodio Hendrix, Wayne Jenkins, Marcus Taylor, Maurice Ward, filed by Tyrell Jeffries.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-002916. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8137499), filed by Maurice Ward, Wayne Jenkins, Marcus Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 Notice of Filing Removal)(Duke, Neil) Modified on 7/23/2019 (ko, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffries v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Jenkins
Represented By: Neil E Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Ward
Represented By: Christopher C Jeffries
Represented By: Neil E Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: marcus taylor
Represented By: Neil E Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evodio Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrell Jeffries
Represented By: James Lamont Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?