Monk v. United States of America et al.
Plaintiff: JESSICA LYNN MONK
Defendant: postal service, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United State Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv02182
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Lynn Monk. United State Postal Service served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019.(Warren, Milton)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Lynn Monk. United States of America served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019.(Warren, Milton)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #8 Affidavit of Service filed by Jessica Lynn Monk on Robert K. Hur was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Writ of Summons USPS served on Robert J. Marshall, USPS on August 2, 2019, filed by Jessica Lynn Monk.(Warren, Milton)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Writ of Summons Robert K. Hur, US Attorney for Dist. of MD served on Robert K. Hur on July 31, 2019, filed by Jessica Lynn Monk.(Warren, Milton) Modified on 8/5/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service William Barr, US Attorney General served on William Barr on August 5, 2019, filed by Jessica Lynn Monk.(Warren, Milton)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Notice (Other) filed by Jessica Lynn Monk was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Jessica Lynn Monk Notice of Discovery Materials (Warren, Milton) Modified on 7/30/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to United State Postal Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jessica Lynn Monk Summons Robert K Hur (Warren, Milton)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Jessica Lynn Monk was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - summons for the U.S. Attorney. To correct this problem, file summons using the event Notice (Other) and link summons to #1 . (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jessica Lynn Monk against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8141734.), filed by JESSICA LYNN MONK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Summons USofA Summons, #5 Summons US POSTAL SERVICE Summons)(Warren, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monk v. United States of America et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA LYNN MONK
Represented By: Jack Ryan Terziu
Represented By: Milton Pope Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: postal service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?