Hall v. T&T Enterprises of Ohio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Earl L Hall, II
Defendant: T&T Enterprises and T&T Enterprises of Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02216
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/11/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl L Hall, II. T&T Enterprises of Ohio, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Taylor, Amy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Earl L. Hall, II must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT FORM AND EVENT) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Taylor, Amy) Modified on 8/13/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to T&T Enterprises of Ohio, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/31/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Earl L Hall, II or counsel for Earl L Hall, II are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/14/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T&T Enterprises ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8151991.), filed by Earl L Hall, II. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Taylor, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. T&T Enterprises of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T Enterprises of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl L Hall, II
Represented By: Amy L Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?