The National Federation of the Blind, Inc. et al v. Lamone et al
Plaintiff: Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland and Joel Zimba
Defendant: Member Kelley A Howells, Member Malcolm L. Funn, Chairman Michael R. Cogan, Member William G. Voelp, Vice-Chairman Patrick J. Hogan, State Administrator Linda H Lamone, Malcolm L. Funn, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp, Michael R. Cogan and Patrick J. Hogan
Case Number: 1:2019cv02228
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/27/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael R. Cogan, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trento, Andrea)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Joel Zimba (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Mark Riccobono, #3 Attachment Declaration of Marie Cobb, #4 Attachment Declaration of Joel Zimba, #5 Attachment Declaration of Ruth Sager, #6 Attachment Declaration of Jonathan Lazar, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan Lazar, #8 Attachment Declaration of Ronza Othman, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of R Othman, #10 Exhibit B to Declaration of R Othman, #11 Exhibit C to Declaration of R Othman, #12 Exhibit D to Declaration of R Othman, #13 Exhibit E to Declaration of R Othman, #14 Exhibit F to Declaration of R Othman, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Jessica)
September 20, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Joel Zimba.(Weber, Jessica)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 Supplemental to #18 Supplemental, #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael R. Cogan, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp Supplement to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Trento, Andrea)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 Supplemental to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael R. Cogan, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (replacing 17-1 filed in error) (Trento, Andrea)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael R. Cogan, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp (Attachments: #1 [FILED IN ERROR - per atty] Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Trento, Andrea) Modified on 9/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer or motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/16/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer or motion to dismiss by Michael R. Cogan, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trento, Andrea)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea William Trento on behalf of All Defendants (Trento, Andrea)
August 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager. Malcolm L. Funn served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Weber, Jessica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager. Kelley A. Howells served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Weber, Jessica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager. William G. Voelp served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Weber, Jessica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager. Patrick J. Hogan served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Weber, Jessica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager. Michael R. Cogan served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Weber, Jessica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager. Linda H. Lamone served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019.(Weber, Jessica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Michael R. Cogan, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, William G. Voelp.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/2/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Joel Zimba or counsel for Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Joel Zimba are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/16/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marie Cobb, Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Joel Zimba (Weber, Jessica)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ruth Sager, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Joel Zimba (Weber, Jessica)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8156141.), filed by Joel Zimba, The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc., Ruth Sager. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Weber, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The National Federation of the Blind, Inc. et al v. Lamone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Cobb
Represented By: Jessica Paulie Weber
Represented By: James T Fetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Sager
Represented By: Jessica Paulie Weber
Represented By: James T Fetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Paulie Weber
Represented By: James T Fetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Federation of the Blind of Maryland
Represented By: Jessica Paulie Weber
Represented By: James T Fetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Zimba
Represented By: Jessica Paulie Weber
Represented By: James T Fetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Kelley A Howells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member Malcolm L. Funn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairman Michael R. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member William G. Voelp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice-Chairman Patrick J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Administrator Linda H Lamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm L. Funn
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley A. Howells
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda H. Lamone
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Voelp
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Cogan
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Hogan
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?