Blaney v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Robert Blaney
Defendant: Beatriz Gonzalez, Jessica Gnagey, Brenda Martineau and Jennifer Fernandes
Case Number: 1:2019cv02264
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Electronic Case Filing Credentials. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/26/2019. (c/m as directed 09/26/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing- Affidavit of Completion of Electronic Case Filing System Training by Robert Blaney (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/20/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Robert Blaney (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Defendants Brenda Martineau and Jessica Gnagey. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/18/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jessica Gnagey, Brenda Martineau (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Plaintiff to complete tutorials on the Court's electronic case filing system; Further Ordered that Plaintiff certify in writing to the Court that he has completed the aforementioned tutorials within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/18/2019. (c/m as directed 09/18/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file and serve within 30 days of this Order a motion for the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants Brenda Martineau and Jessica Gnagey. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/17/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jennifer Fernandes. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence re: Corrected Proposed Summons (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Miscellaneous Correspondence was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Corrected Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Corrected Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Corrected Summons to #7 . (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Corrected Summons (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Blaney. Jessica Gnagey served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Brenda Martineau served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Electronic Case Filing Credentials by Robert Blaney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jennifer Fernandes, Jessica Gnagey, Beatriz Gonzalez, Brenda Martineau. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Service of Process. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/12/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Robert Blaney. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Fernandes, Jessica Gnagey, Beatriz Gonzalez, Brenda Martineau ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637034797.), filed by Robert Blaney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Summons) (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaney v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Gnagey
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Martineau
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Blaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?