Smith et al v. Gustafson
Plaintiff: Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey and James P. Smith, Jr.
Defendant: Carl Oscar Gustafson
Case Number: 1:2019cv02291
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #8 Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/29/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey, James P. Smith, Jr (Prisbe, John)
August 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/23/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey, and James P Smith, Jr. to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey, and James P Smith, Jr. files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/23/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/8/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey, James P Smith, Jr. or counsel for Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey, James P Smith, Jr. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/22/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Carl Oscar Gustafson.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carl Oscar Gustafson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8168401.), filed by James P Smith, Jr., Michael T. Connelly, Clyde R Coursey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Prisbe, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Connelly
Represented By: John Thomas Prisbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde R Coursey
Represented By: John Thomas Prisbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: John Thomas Prisbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Oscar Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?