Frederick P. Winner, Ltd. v. The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frederick P. Winner, Ltd.
Defendant: The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02302
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal w/out prejudice filed by Frederick P. Winner, Ltd. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/20/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frederick P. Winner, Ltd. (Maguire, Erinn)
September 18, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frederick P. Winner, Ltd.. The Boston Beer Company, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019.(Brennen, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to The Boston Beer Company, Inc..(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Boston Beer Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8171487.), filed by Frederick P. Winner, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons The Boston Beer Company, Inc.)(Brennen, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick P. Winner, Ltd. v. The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick P. Winner, Ltd.
Represented By: Erinn M Maguire
Represented By: Robert Scott Brennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?