Stamboni, III v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Plaintiff: Daniel Paul Stamboni, III
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Case Number: 1:2019cv02314
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/1/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: Proceeding before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/1/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 Standing Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/1/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/30/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/22/2020.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/26/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Clasing, Kevin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: 11 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Daniel Paul Stamboni, III was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings > Correspondence > Magistrate Judge- Consent To. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 9/23/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Angotti, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Albert Clasing on behalf of Daniel Paul Stamboni, III (Clasing, Kevin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Great Northern Insurance Company for Chubb Group of Insurance Companies.(Angotti, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/19/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 The above documents #2 through #6 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of filing of state court discovery material by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 30 days as to Chubb Group of Insurance Companies.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, filed by Daniel Paul Stamboni, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-003717 CN. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637117081), filed by Chubb Group of Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamboni, III v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Represented By: Matthew T Angotti
Represented By: Alyson Tucker Parker Kierzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Paul Stamboni, III
Represented By: Karmen M Slezak
Represented By: Kevin Albert Clasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?