Sirius Signal, L.L.C. v. Weems & Plath, LLC
Plaintiff: Sirius Signal, L.L.C.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Weems & Plath, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: EMLinQ LLC and Anthony Covelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv02330
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #26 Scheduling Order by Extending All Deadlines by 30 Days, Including Deadline to Request Modifications to Scheduling Order by Anthony Covelli, Sirius Signal, L.L.C.(Cole, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #27 Stipulation, filed by Anthony Covelli, Sirius Signal, L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/7/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #22 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim Containing Waiver of Service by Third-Party Defendant Anthony Covelli, Extending Deadlines for Counter-Defendant Sirius Signal, L.L.C. and Third-Party Defendant Anthony Covelli to Respond to Counterclaim Through and Including October 31, 2019, and Third-Party Claim, and Reserving All Rights, Including Rights Regarding Personal Jurisdiction and Venue by Anthony Covelli, Sirius Signal, L.L.C.(Cole, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued 21 days as to Anthony Covelli, EMLinQ LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Weems & Plath, LLC re #22 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim for the clerk to issue summons (Prawde, Alyse)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Weems & Plath, LLC re #22 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim for the clerk to issue summons (Prawde, Alyse)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant Weems & Plath, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against EMLinQ LLC, Anthony Covelli, COUNTERCLAIM against Sirius Signal, L.L.C. by Weems & Plath, LLC.(Prawde, Alyse)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Weems & Plath, LLC (Prawde, Alyse)
September 25, 2019 Check Received on 09/25/2019 from Weems & Plath, LLC. Check Number: 129590. Amount: $$11,872.70. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/18/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by Weems & Plath, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Check Received on 9/16/2019 from WEEMS & PLATH, LLC. Check Number: 1021. Amount: $24,455.88. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/9/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/9/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Shorten Time by Weems & Plath, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Weems & Plath, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Bryant on behalf of All Defendants (Bryant, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Paperless ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/5/2019.
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Weems & Plath, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse)
August 29, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Francis Maloney on behalf of Weems & Plath, LLC (Maloney, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyse Lauren Prawde on behalf of Weems & Plath, LLC (Prawde, Alyse)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sirius Signal, L.L.C.. Weems & Plath, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019.(Cole, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Case Management Order, Standing ORder 2018-04, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge, Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint served on CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Company as Resident Agent for Weems & PLath, LLC on 8/16/2019, filed by Sirius Signal, L.L.C..(Cole, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Weems & Plath, LLC..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/14/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Sirius Signal, L.L.C. or counsel for Sirius Signal, L.L.C. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/28/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sirius Signal, L.L.C. (Cole, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Weems & Plath, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8177047.), filed by Sirius Signal, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cole, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sirius Signal, L.L.C. v. Weems & Plath, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sirius Signal, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Weems & Plath, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: EMLinQ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Anthony Covelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?