Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. v. Hicks, et al.
Plaintiff: Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. t/a Greenspring Montessori School and Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc.
Defendant: Brightview Landscapes, LLC and Allen W. Hicks
Case Number: 1:2019cv02358
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brightview Landscapes, LLC.(Schipper, Susan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Hearing/Trial on Motion to Remand (ECF 20) (Schipper, Susan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand filed by Brightview Landscapes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schipper, Susan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bourgeois, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Sever and Remand Claim against Defendant Allen Hicks filed by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc..(Bourgeois, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and in Opposition to Brightview Landscapes, LLC's Motion to Sever and Remand Claim Against Defendant Allen Hicks)(Bourgeois, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.5(a) Certification (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Schipper, Susan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. (Brown, George)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #9 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Brightview Landscapes, LLC.(Schipper, Susan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #15 consent motion to set briefing schedule. Plaintiff's combined motion to remand and opposition to #3 motion to sever and remand claim against Defendant Hicks and #4 motion to dismiss is due by September 23; Brightview's combined opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand and reply to #4 motion to dismiss is due by October 14, Plaintiff's reply to its motion to remand is due by October 28 and Brightview's reply to #3 motion to sever and remand is due by October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/23/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah) Modified on 8/26/2019 to correct docket text (tds, Deputy Clerk).
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc.(Bourgeois, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Shuster on behalf of Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. (Shuster, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by George E Brown on behalf of Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. (Brown, George)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Augustine Bourgeois on behalf of Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. (Bourgeois, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE-Declaration of Susan R. Schipper by Brightview Landscapes, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Correspondence-Standing Order Concerning Removal for Defendant Hicks(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (c/m-08-16-2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/16/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (c/m-08-16-2019)
August 16, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE-Declaration of Executive Vice President by Brightview Landscapes, LLC. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brightview Landscapes, LLC, Allen W. Hicks, filed by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Allen W. Hicks, Brightview Landscapes, LLC., & Summons Reissued as to Allen W. Hicks, Brightview Landscapes, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Allen W. Hicks, filed by Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brightview Landscapes, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Alsip, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Sever and Remand Claim against Defendant Allen Hicks by Brightview Landscapes, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of BrightView's Motion to Sever and Remand Claim against Defendant Allen Hicks, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Alsip, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brightview Landscapes, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BrightView Holdings, Inc. for Brightview Landscapes, LLC.(Alsip, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number 03-C-18-012844. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8182086), filed by Brightview Landscapes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Summons to Brightview, #3 Exhibit Summons to A. Hicks, #4 Exhibit Declaration of S. Schipper with attachments, #5 Exhibit Declaration of J. Gottsegen, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alsip, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. v. Hicks, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brightview Landscapes, LLC
Represented By: James A Dunbar
Represented By: Susan Ruth Schipper
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Alsip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen W. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc. t/a Greenspring Montessori School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montessori Society of Central Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: George E Brown
Represented By: David J Shuster
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?