Vayner v. Bloomingdale's Inc.
Plaintiff: Alla Vayner
Defendant: Bloomingdale's Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02372
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Latieke Lyles. Directing attorney Latieke Lyles to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bloomingdale's Inc. answer due 10/30/2019.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/30/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bloomingdale's Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Macy's, Inc. for Bloomingdale's Inc..(Amelung, Courtney)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Latieke Lyles (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8264086.) by Bloomingdale's Inc.(Amelung, Courtney)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bloomingdale's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Amelung, Courtney)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alla Vayner. Bloomingdale's Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019.(Rose, George)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bloomingdale's Inc..(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corrected Correspondence re: Corrected Complaint (Rose, George)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 (FILED IN ERROR-COMPLAINT REFILED) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Bloomingdale's Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8184054.), filed by Alla Vayner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rose, George) Modified on 8/19/2019 (kos, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vayner v. Bloomingdale's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alla Vayner
Represented By: George A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdale's Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Blair Amelung
Represented By: Latieke M Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?