Betch et al v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Irvin-John Betch, Jr. and Patricia-Ann Betch
Defendant: APG Federal Credit Union and Charles E. Kelly, CFO
Case Number: 1:2019cv02406
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331ni
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Attachments Under Seal re #4 MOTION for Reconsideration/Clarification filed by Irvin-John Betch, Jr, Patricia-Ann Betch. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Special Cause, #2 Civilian Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration/Clarification re #3 Order denying motion to seal and dismissing case, by Irvin-John Betch, Jr, Patricia-Ann Betch. (Attachments: #1 copy of Order dated 8/23/19, #2 Notice of Filing Attachments Under Seal, #3 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Seal Case; Case UNSEALED; DISMISSING #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/23/2019. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal by Irvin-John Betch, Jr, Patricia-Ann Betch. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APG Federal Credit Union, Charles E. Kelly, CFO by Irvin-John Betch, Jr, Patricia-Ann Betch. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637117173) (Attachments: #1 Table of Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Cover Letter) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betch et al v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin-John Betch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia-Ann Betch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APG Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Kelly, CFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?