Malone et al v. Wicomico County Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Gosier Daniel and Donna Lynn Malone
Defendant: Brittany Stevenson, Wicomico County Maryland, Conmed, LLC, James Charles Bare, Doretha Renata Carroll, Otha Lee Byrd, George Kaloroumakis, Forrest Devine, Robert Lee ODay, Otha Lee Byrd, Jr., Robert Lee O'Day and John and Jane Does 1-25
Case Number: 1:2019cv02412
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983d
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Otha Lee Byrd, Jr, Doretha Renata Carroll, George Kaloroumakis, Robert Lee O'Day, Brittany Stevenson, Wicomico County Maryland(Peter, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Douglas Peter on behalf of Forrest Devine (Peter, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Lynn Malone. Conmed, LLC served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Jay)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Douglas Peter on behalf of Otha Lee Byrd, Jr, Doretha Renata Carroll, George Kaloroumakis, Robert Lee O'Day, Brittany Stevenson, Wicomico County Maryland (Peter, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to James Charles Bare, Otha Lee Byrd, Jr, Doretha Renata Carroll, Conmed, LLC, Forrest Devine, George Kaloroumakis, Robert Lee O'Day, Brittany Stevenson, Wicomico County Maryland.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/22/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Gosier Daniel, Donna Lynn Malone or counsel for Gosier Daniel, Donna Lynn Malone are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/5/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,( $400 fee, receipt #0416-8190645) filed by Donna Lynn Malone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Appointment, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice of Claim, #4 Summons Bare Summons, #5 Summons Byrd Summons, #6 Summons Carroll Summons, #7 Summons Conmed Summons, #8 Summons Devine Summons, #9 Summons Kaloroumakis Summons, #10 Summons O'Day Summons, #11 Summons Stevenson Summons, #12 Summons Wicomico County Summons)(Bonadio, Nicholas) Modified on 8/22/2019 (kos, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone et al v. Wicomico County Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Stevenson
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wicomico County Maryland
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conmed, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Charles Bare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doretha Renata Carroll
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otha Lee Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kaloroumakis
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Devine
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee ODay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otha Lee Byrd, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee O'Day
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gosier Daniel
Represented By: Jay Dante Miller
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Bonadio
Represented By: Thomas W. Keilty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lynn Malone
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Bonadio
Represented By: Jay Dante Miller
Represented By: Thomas W. Keilty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?