Just Puppies, Inc.et al v. Frosh et al
Plaintiff: Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson, d/b/a 2 Mile Kennel Jodie Hancock, Today's Pet, Inc. d/b/a Today's Pet, Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet, Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville, Today's Pet, Inc., Just Puppies of Maryland Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC, Jodie Hancock and Charm City Puppies, LLC
Defendant: Maryland House Economic Matters Committee, General Assembly of Maryland, Brian E. Frosh, Maryland State Senate Finance Committee, General Assembly of Maryland, Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Maryland and Division of Consumer Protection Office of the Attorney General
Amicus Curiae: The Humane Society of the United States
Case Number: 1:2019cv02439
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/15/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 Notice (Other) by Charm City Puppies, LLC, Jodie Hancock, Just Puppies of Maryland Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC, Today's Pet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borgerson, Meagan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Division of Consumer Protection Office of the Attorney General, Brian E. Frosh, Maryland House Economic Matters Committee, General Assembly of Maryland, Maryland State Senate Finance Committee, General Assembly of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Robert Dietrich on behalf of All Defendants (Dietrich, Ryan)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/1/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Charm City Puppies, LLC, Jodie Hancock, Just Puppies of Maryland Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC, Today's Pet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borgerson, Meagan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rebecca Ann Cary. Directing attorney Rebecca Ann Cary to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Amicus Brief by The Humane Society of the United States (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION Leave to File an Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/23/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Leave to File an Amicus Brief by The Humane Society of the United States (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Langlois, Marie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Humane Society of the United States (Langlois, Marie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebecca Ann Cary (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8247592.) by The Humane Society of the United States(Langlois, Marie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Division of Consumer Protection Office of the Attorney General, Brian E. Frosh, Maryland House Economic Matters Committee, General Assembly of Maryland, Maryland State Senate Finance Committee, General Assembly of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Katz on behalf of All Defendants (Katz, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Division of Consumer Protection Office of the Attorney General, Brian E. Frosh, Maryland House Economic Matters Committee, General Assembly of Maryland, Maryland State Senate Finance Committee, General Assembly of Maryland.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique, Jodie Hancock, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville, Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson, Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet, Today's Pet, Inc. d/b/a Today's Pet (Borgerson, Meagan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8195432.), filed by Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet, Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique, Jodie Hancock, Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson, Today's Pet, Inc. d/b/a Today's Pet, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Borgerson, Meagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Just Puppies, Inc.et al v. Frosh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: d/b/a 2 Mile Kennel Jodie Hancock
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Today's Pet, Inc. d/b/a Today's Pet
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Today's Pet, Inc.
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies of Maryland Inc.
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies, Inc.
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobrad, LLC
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Hancock
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charm City Puppies, LLC
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Represented By: Stephen B Stern
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland House Economic Matters Committee, General Assembly of Maryland
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Represented By: Ryan Robert Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Represented By: Ryan Robert Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland State Senate Finance Committee, General Assembly of Maryland
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Represented By: Ryan Robert Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Consumer Protection Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Represented By: Ryan Robert Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Marie Claire Langlois
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?