Allegis Group Inc v. Quantum Market Research, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allegis Group Inc
Defendant: Quantum Market Research, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02509
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allegis Group Inc. Quantum Market Research, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019.(Flax, Sherry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Allegis Group Inc identifying Other Affiliate Allegis Global Solutions, Inc. for Allegis Group Inc.(Flax, Sherry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Deficiency Notice as to Allegis Group Inc -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/10/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Quantum Market Research, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Quantum Market Research, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8208913.), filed by Allegis Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Flax, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegis Group Inc v. Quantum Market Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Market Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegis Group Inc
Represented By: Sherry H Flax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?