SB Energy Investments, LLC v. Crabtree et al
Plaintiff: SB Energy Investments, LLC
Defendant: SolX Energy International, Inc., Mark Crabtree, SolX Energy Limited and SolX Energy LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02522
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SB Energy Investments, LLC (Romberger, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Crabtree, filed by SB Energy Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Romberger, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/4/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 7, 9) by SB Energy Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romberger, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Plaintiff SB Energy Investments, LLC's Complaint for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Disclosure Requirements of Local Rule 103.3 and for Its Failure to Plead the Requisite Factual Bases to Invoke the Diversity Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of this Court by SolX Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kerr, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mark Crabtree, SolX Energy International, Inc., SolX Energy LLC (Kerr, Charles)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Plaintiff SB Energy Investments, LLC's Complaint for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Disclosure Requirements of Local Rule 103.3 and for Failure to Plead the Requisite Factual Bases to Invoke the Diversity Subject-Matter Jurisdiction of this Court by Mark Crabtree, SolX Energy International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kerr, Charles)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SB Energy Investments, LLC. SolX Energy LLC served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019.(Romberger, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SB Energy Investments, LLC. SolX Energy International, Inc. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019.(Romberger, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SB Energy Investments, LLC. Mark Crabtree served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019.(Romberger, Timothy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SB Energy Investments, LLC(Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant SolX Energy, LLC) (Romberger, Timothy)
September 4, 2019 Deficiency Notice to SB Energy Investments, LLC. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/11/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Mark Crabtree, SolX Energy International, Inc., SolX Energy LLC, SolX Energy Limited.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8209818.), filed by SB Energy Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Romberger, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SB Energy Investments, LLC v. Crabtree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolX Energy International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles M Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Crabtree
Represented By: Charles M Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolX Energy Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolX Energy LLC
Represented By: Charles M Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SB Energy Investments, LLC
Represented By: Ruth Ann Grace Azeredo
Represented By: Timothy William Romberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?