International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. SRI Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund and Tim D. Maitland
Defendant: Guru Switzoor and SRI Construction LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02586
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Report and Recommendations. Mail sent to SRI Construction LLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/10/2019. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Complaint,, filed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland (Supplement to Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees Request Pursuant to Promissory Note) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sznyter, Judith)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Interim ORDER re: Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/20/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for reviewing a complaint for judgment by confession. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/10/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Confession of Judgment against SRI Construction LLC, Guru Switzoor ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8218824.), filed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Judgment by Confession, #8 Affidavit for Judgment by Confession, #9 Notice of Entry of Judgment by Confession, #10 Proposed Order for Notice, #11 Certificate of Service)(Sznyter, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. SRI Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim D. Maitland
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guru Switzoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?