Parker v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Corey D. Parker
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv02620
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/4/2019. (c/m 11/4/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file within 28 days an Amended Complaint and either pay the full filing fee or file Motion to Proceed in Forma. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/27/2019. (c/m 9/27/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/11/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Corey D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?