Tull v. Mieras et al
Plaintiff: Amanda P. Tull
Defendant: Lawrence J Mieras, American Portfolios Financial Services, Inc., American Portfolios and American Portfolios Advisors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02646
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: (Phillips, James)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amanda P. Tull. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Phillips, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mitchell H Cobert. Directing attorney Mitchell H Cobert to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell H. Cobert (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8288007.) by American Portfolios, American Portfolios Advisors, Inc., American Portfolios Financial Services, Inc., Lawrence J Mieras (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service to Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Della Porta, Armand)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by American Portfolios, American Portfolios Advisors, Inc., American Portfolios Financial Services, Inc., Lawrence J Mieras (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Della Porta, Armand)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J Della Porta, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Della Porta, Armand)
September 28, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: letter to Judge G. Russell (Phillips, James)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Amanda P. Tull, #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Amanda P. Tull, #3 Affidavit of Service filed by Amanda P. Tull were filed incorrectly. **Please refile affidavits under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event, and enter the service date when requested. The documents have been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document links have been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on American Portfolios Financial Services, Inc. on 09/20/2019, filed by Amanda P. Tull. (Attachments: #1 Receipt certified)(Phillips, James) Modified on 9/26/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on American Portfolios Advisiors, Inc. on 09/20/2019, filed by Amanda P. Tull. (Attachments: #1 Receipt certified)(Phillips, James) Modified on 9/26/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on American Portfolios on 09/20/2019, filed by Amanda P. Tull. (Attachments: #1 Receipt certified)(Phillips, James) Modified on 9/26/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to American Portfolios, American Portfolios Advisors, Inc., American Portfolios Financial Services, Inc., Lawrence J Mieras.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8227659.), filed by Amanda P. Tull. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Phillips, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tull v. Mieras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J Mieras
Represented By: Mitchell H Cobert
Represented By: Armand J Della Porta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Portfolios Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell H Cobert
Represented By: Armand J Della Porta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Portfolios
Represented By: Mitchell H Cobert
Represented By: Armand J Della Porta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Portfolios Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell H Cobert
Represented By: Armand J Della Porta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda P. Tull
Represented By: Norman B Arnoff
Represented By: James Harrison Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?