Shankle v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angela Shankle
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv02849
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/6/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Shea, Stephen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/27/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8261524.), filed by Angela Shankle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Shea, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shankle v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Shankle
Represented By: Stephen F Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?