Unigarro v. Saul
Plaintiff: Daniel Unigarro
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv02889
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service of the summons and complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/8/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/4/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew M Saul (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Unigarro(Shea, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Shea, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, filed by Daniel Unigarro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Shea, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unigarro v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Unigarro
Represented By: Stephen F Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?