Fusion Capital 1, LLC et al v. JB Brothers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fusion Capital 2, LLC and Fusion Capital 1, LLC
Defendant: Jason Park, JB Brothers, Inc., Jeong Hi Ju and Yoon Ho Ju
Case Number: 1:2019cv02947
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MARGINAL ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/4/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC.(McKenzie, Raymond)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by JB Brothers, Inc., Jeong Hi Ju, Yoon Ho Ju, Jason Park (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunderson, Eric)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC. JB Brothers, Inc. served on 10/14/19, Jeong Hi Ju served on 10/19/19, Jason Park served on 10/29/19, Yoon Ho Ju served on 10/29/19 .(McKenzie, Raymond) Modified on 11/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #10 Affidavit of Service filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC, #9 Affidavit of Service filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC, #12 Affidavit of Service filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC, #11 Affidavit of Service filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile all returns together using the event "Summons returned executed" and input the proper service date for each defendant when prompted by the system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Yoon Ho Ju on 10/29/19, filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC.(McKenzie, Raymond) Modified on 11/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jason Park on 10/29/19, filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC.(McKenzie, Raymond) Modified on 11/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeong Hi Ju on 10/19/19, filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC.(McKenzie, Raymond) Modified on 11/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on JB Brothers, Inc. on 10/14/19, filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC.(McKenzie, Raymond) Modified on 11/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to JB Brothers, Inc., Jeong Hi Ju, Yoon Ho Ju, Jason Park.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC re #1 Complaint, Summons to Yoon Ho Ju (McKenzie, Raymond)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC re #1 Complaint, Summons to Jeong Hi Ju (McKenzie, Raymond)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC re #1 Complaint, Summons to Jason Park (McKenzie, Raymond)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC re #1 Complaint, Summons to JB Brothers, Inc. (McKenzie, Raymond)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Fusion Capital 1, LLC, Fusion Capital 2, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (McKenzie, Raymond)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses and Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses and Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses and Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JB Brothers, Inc., Jeong Hi Ju, Yoon Ho Ju, Jason Park ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8282074.), filed by Fusion Capital 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Regional Developer Agreement)(McKenzie, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusion Capital 1, LLC et al v. JB Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Park
Represented By: Eric William Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Eric William Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeong Hi Ju
Represented By: Eric William Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoon Ho Ju
Represented By: Eric William Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fusion Capital 2, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Thomas McKenzie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fusion Capital 1, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Thomas McKenzie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?