Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. v. Iron World Manufacturing, LLC
Plaintiff: Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.
Defendant: Iron World Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03027
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file and serve on Defendant a motion for entry of default by the Clerk and a motion for default judgment, or provide a report why such motions would be inappropriate. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/18/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.. Iron World Manufacturing, LLC served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019.(Getty, Justus)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 [FILED IN ERROR - atty to refile] ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc..(Getty, Justus) Modified on 10/28/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Getty, Justus)
October 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Iron World Manufacturing, LLC.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark was filed incorrectly. **Please refile using Report on Filing Patent/Trademark under Other Documents. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LEB Holdings USA for Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc..(Getty, Justus)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #2 **Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement was filed incorrectly.***Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) Correspondence re: Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Getty, Justus) Modified on 10/16/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARRETTE OUTDOOR LIVING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8295057.), filed by BARRETTE OUTDOOR LIVING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US PAT NO. 8413965, #2 Exhibit US PAT NO. 8413332, #3 Exhibit US PAT NO. 9151075, #4 Exhibit Photos of infringing materials, #5 Cover Letter Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons in a Civil Action)(Getty, Justus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. v. Iron World Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.
Represented By: Justus Lee Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron World Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?