Quantum Equity I LLC et al v. Bethune-Cookman University, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Quantum Equity I LLC and Quantum Realty Capital, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A. and Bethune-Cookman University, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03036
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Bethune-Cookman University, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A.'s answers due 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/21/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Virginia)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Wood Barnhart on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A. (Barnhart, Virginia)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Bass on behalf of Bethune-Cookman University, Inc. (Bass, Timothy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quantum Equity I LLC. Bethune-Cookman University, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019.(Goldman, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quantum Equity I LLC. Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019.(Goldman, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Quantum Equity I LLC, #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Quantum Equity I LLC was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile affidavits under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event, and enter the service date when requested. The documents have been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document links have been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Exhibits, 103.3 Disclosure Statemen t served on Valencia Gallon-Slibles on 10/31/2019, filed by Quantum Equity I LLC.(Goldman, Robert) Modified on 11/5/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Exhibits, 103.3 Disclosure Statement served on Monica Furner on 10/31/2019, filed by Quantum Equity I LLC.(Goldman, Robert) Modified on 11/5/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Quantum Equity I LLC, Quantum Realty Capital, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Quantum Dormitory Equity I, LLC, Other Affiliate QRC Equity, LLC for Quantum Equity I LLC, Quantum Realty Capital, LLC.(Goldman, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bethune-Cookman University, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/24/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8296865.), filed by Quantum Equity I LLC, Quantum Realty Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Goldman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quantum Equity I LLC et al v. Bethune-Cookman University, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A.
Represented By: Virginia Wood Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethune-Cookman University, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Equity I LLC
Represented By: Robert Jay Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Realty Capital, LLC
Represented By: Robert Jay Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?