Johnson v. Bombardier Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Johnson
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc., Bombardier Inc., BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORP., Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA, Inc., National Railroad Passenger Corp., BOMBARDIER MASS TRANSIT CORP., Maryland Transit Administration, Bombardier Transportation Services, CSX Real Property, Inc., Maryland Midland RAILWAY, INC., John Doe, Jane Doe, Bombardier Transit Corporation and Bombardier Transportation Services USA Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03044
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/4/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bombardier Mass Transit Corp., Bombardier Transit Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA, Inc., Bombardier Transportation Services USA Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brigitte)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to National Railroad Passenger Corp. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Brandon Johnson re #1 Complaint (Litman, Donald)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Brandon Johnson was filed incorrectly. Did not file the summons for defendant, National Railroad Passenger Corp. Using the Notice Entry; please file summons for defendant, National Railroad Passenger Corp. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bombardier Inc., Bombardier Mass Transit Corp., Bombardier Transit Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA, Inc., Bombardier Transportation Services USA Corporation, CSX Real Property, Inc., CSX Transportation Inc., Maryland Midland Railway, Inc. and Maryland Transit Administration.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Brandon Johnson re #1 Complaint (Litman, Donald)
October 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Brandon Johnson re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Litman, Donald)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8297674.), filed by Brandon Johnson.(Litman, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bombardier Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOMBARDIER MASS TRANSIT CORP.
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Transit Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Transportation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Real Property, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Midland RAILWAY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Transit Corporation
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Transportation Services USA Corporation
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Donald Saunders Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?