Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC v. Engie Services, U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Engie Services, U.S., Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Chesapeake Systems, LLC, Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Telkonet, Inc., American Energy Services, LLC and EASI Electrical Automation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03048
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued 21 days as to American Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Systems, LLC, Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc., EASI Electrical Automation Services, Inc., Telkonet, Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against EASI Electrical Automation Services, Inc., Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Telkonet, Inc., Chesapeake Systems, LLC, American Energy Services, LLC, filed by Engie Services, U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Third Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Third Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Third Party Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Third Party Complaint, #6 Summons to Third Party Complaint - EASI Electrical Automation Services, Inc., #7 Summons to Third Party Complaint - Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc., #8 Summons to Third Party Complaint - Telkonet, Inc., #9 Summons to Third Party Complaint - Chesapeake Systems, LLC, #10 Summons to Third Party Complaint - American Energy Services, LLC)(Della Porta, Armand)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Third Party Complaint filed by Engie Services, U.S., Inc. was filed incorrectly. **All parties must be listed individually in the caption of the Third Party Complaint. Please refile the corrected Third Party Complaint with all attachments. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 [FILED IN ERROR] THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Electrical Automation services, Inc., Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Telkonet, Inc., American Energy Services, LLC, Chesapeake Systems, LLC, filed by Engie Services, U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Third Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Third Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Third Party Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Third Party Complaint, #6 Summons Summon on a third-Party Complaint - Electrical Automation Services, Inc., #7 Summons Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc., #8 Summons Summons on a third-Party Complai - Telkonet, Inc., #9 Summons Summons on a third-Party Complaint - Chesapeake systems, LLC, #10 Summons Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - American Energy Services, LLC)(Della Porta, Armand) Modified on 12/11/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Marginal ORDER GRANTING #11 Joint Status Report filed by Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/9/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/9/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT JOINT Status Report Requesting Modification of Schedule by Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC(Brown, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/9/2020. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Engie Services U.S. Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Engie Services, U.S., Inc..(Della Porta, Armand)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Engie Services, U.S., Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Cordish Company for Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC.(Brown, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Engie Services, U.S., Inc. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC was filed incorrectly. Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Reinecker on behalf of Thirty-Four Marketplace, LLC (Reinecker, Todd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Thirty-Four Marketplace, LLC re #1 Complaint Summons - Request for Issuance of Summons (Brown, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thirty-Four Marketplace, LLC (Brown, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Engie Services, U.S., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8298905.), filed by Thirty-Four Marketplace, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC v. Engie Services, U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Engie Services, U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Armand J Della Porta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thirty-Four Market Place, LLC
Represented By: Todd Michael Reinecker
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chesapeake Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dominion Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Telkonet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: American Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: EASI Electrical Automation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?