Deaver v. Saul
Plaintiff: Grant Eric Jude Deaver
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2019cv03102
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service of the summons and complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/1/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (kos, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/25/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Grant Eric Jude Deaver(Murahari, Arjun)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Grant Eric Jude Deaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Murahari, Arjun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deaver v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Eric Jude Deaver
Represented By: Arjun Kuncham Murahari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?