Williams v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Williams
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03116
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/18/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 38. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority Pertaining to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims as Time Barred (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for December 18, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re All THA Track Cases denying Defendant's 1772 Motion to Amend and Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Addressing Dismissal of Claims in the THA track. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Originally filed 11/26/19)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM re All THA Track Cases. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/21/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 20. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Parties' Proposed Agenda for November 21, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/6/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 10. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 ***DEFICIENCY NOTICE - Pursuant to Case Management Orders, please file the Short Form Complaint regarding this case in 17-md-2775. When prompted if you would like to spread the text, please answer no, as the complaint has already been filed in the individual case. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 48. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
October 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8314369.), filed by Paul Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dwyer, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Williams
Represented By: Alexander Grier Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?