The Halal Shack Inc. v. Legends Halal Shack, LLC
Plaintiff: The Halal Shack Inc.
Defendant: Legends Halal Shack, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03126
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Legends Halal Shack, LLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by The Halal Shack Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER requesting default or status report within 30 days. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/2/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Halal Shack Inc.. Legends Halal Shack, LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019.(Bass, Timothy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel I Schloss. Directing attorney Daniel I Schloss to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel I. Schloss (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8326493.) by The Halal Shack Inc.(Bass, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Bass, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Legends Halal Shack, LLC.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 11/5/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Halal Shack Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Halal Shack HowardU LLC, Other Affiliate The Halal Shack RPI LLC, Other Affiliate The Halal Shack SDSU LLC, Other Affiliate The Halal Shack UAlbany LLC, Other Affiliate The Halal Shack UMBC LLC for The Halal Shack Inc..(Bass, Timothy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8315865.), filed by The Halal Shack Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons)(Bass, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Halal Shack Inc. v. Legends Halal Shack, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legends Halal Shack, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Halal Shack Inc.
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Represented By: Daniel I Schloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?