Lane v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: D.P.M. Craig R. Lane and Craig R. Lane
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II, JOANNE CHIEDI and Alex Azar
Case Number: 1:2019cv03183
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Alex Azar, Joanne Chiedi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Thompson Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1. Lender History, #3 Exhibit 2. Lender Insurance Application, #4 Exhibit 3. Lane Judgment, #5 Exhibit 4. October 15, 1998 Letter, #6 Exhibit 5. PSC Debt Calculation Report, #7 Exhibit 6. Lane Correspondence for January 2018, #8 Exhibit 7. Lane Default Letter March 8, 2018, #9 Exhibit B. MVA Records, #10 Exhibit C. Anointed Harvest Records, #11 Exhibit D. Property Records, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Selwood, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Alex Azar, Joanne Chiedi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Selwood, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: 9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Craig R. Lane, 10 Summons Returned Executed filed by Craig R. Lane. **Summons for Government defendants should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Please re-file using event Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig R. Lane. All Defendants.(Kolawole, Olufolajimi)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig R. Lane. All Defendants.(Kolawole, Olufolajimi)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued 60 days as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Craig R. Lane re #6 Notice (Other) Summons (Kolawole, Olufolajimi)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 -FILED IN ERROR, REFILED CORRECTLY BY COUNSEL- NOTICE by Craig R. Lane Summons (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kolawole, Olufolajimi) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
November 4, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/4/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Craig R. Lane or counsel for Craig R. Lane are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/18/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Craig R. Lane was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons and Civil Cover Sheet. Summons for federal defendants to include U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. To correct this problem, file Summons and Civil Cover Sheet using Other Filings > Notices > Notice (Other) > and link Summons and Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Craig R. Lane (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Preliminary Restraining Order)(Kolawole, Olufolajimi)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Judicial Review of Administrative Agency Decision against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8327047.), filed by Craig R. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ALJ Ruling, #2 Exhibit B - Board Ruling Dismissing Appeal, #3 Exhibit C - Lane Appeal To Review ALJ Ruling, #4 Exhibit D - Lane Opposition to IG MT Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E - Paula Thompson-Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit F- Anderson ALJ Decision, #7 Exhibit G - Anderson Board Decision, #8 Exhibit H - DVA Job Rescind, #9 Exhibit I - Medically Under-served Area Map, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Exclusion, #11 Exhibit K - Lane Medical Report, #12 Exhibit L-IG MT Dismiss, #13 Exhibit M - Financial Hardship, #14 Exhibit N - Affidavit CLane, #15 Exhibit O - Insurance Notice of Exclusion, #16 Exhibit P1 - Summary Bank Statement, #17 Exhibit P2 - Bank Statement, #18 Exhibit Q - Mercy Hospital Notice, #19 Exhibit R - JAL Explanation, #20 Exhibit S - TurnOff Cancellation Notice)(Kolawole, Olufolajimi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.P.M. Craig R. Lane
Represented By: Olufolajimi A Kolawole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R. Lane
Represented By: Olufolajimi A Kolawole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE CHIEDI
Represented By: Patrick Garrett Selwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Patrick Garrett Selwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?